THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 15:30:13 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1051 Queen St. W
Office 1239
Toronto ON M6J 1H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-535-8501
Extension: 30447
Fax: 416-583-1240
Address: C A M H
60 White Squirrel Way
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. DAVID MATTHEWS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Matthews (CPSO#: 104302 )
Business Address: 1051 Queen St W
Suite 1239
Toronto ON M6J 1H3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1051 Queen St. W
Office 1239
Toronto ON M6J 1H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-535-8501
Extension: 30447
Fax: 416-583-1240
Address: C A M H
60 White Squirrel Way
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. DAVID MATTHEWS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Matthews (CPSO#: 104302 )
Business Address: 1051 Queen St W
Suite 1239
Toronto ON M6J 1H3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID PATRICK MACDONALD MATTHEWS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATTHEWS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID PATRICK MACDONALD MATTHEWS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATTHEWS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Mar 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014