THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:25:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: Younan, Sarah Adel Labib (Used Until: 24 May 2016)
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto Ontario M5G 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 978-6976
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health System Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarah Morgan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Morgan (CPSO#: 104319 )
Business Address: 57 Philips View Cres
Richmond Hill ON L4E 0S9

General Information

Former Name: Younan, Sarah Adel Labib (Used Until: 24 May 2016)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto Ontario M5G 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 978-6976
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health System Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarah Morgan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Morgan (CPSO#: 104319 )
Business Address: 57 Philips View Cres
Richmond Hill ON L4E 0S9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH ADEL LABIB MORGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORGAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH ADEL LABIB MORGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORGAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014