THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:48:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Aristotelian University of Thessaloniki, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University
Division of Rheumatology
1280 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8S 4L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1-1280 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: 905-521-2100
Extension: 76714
Fax: 905-521-4971
Address: 1-1280 Main St W
McMaster University Medical Centre
Department of Medicine
HSC 3H1B
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: 905-521-2100
Extension: 76714
Fax: 905-521-4971

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 Jan 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre Regional Rehabilitation Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Chedoke Hospital Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre Regional Rehabilitation Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Konstantinos Tselios Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Tselios (CPSO#: 104321 )
Business Address: 1280 Main St W
HSC 3H1B
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK
Medical School: Aristotelian University of Thessaloniki, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University
Division of Rheumatology
1280 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8S 4L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1-1280 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: 905-521-2100
Extension: 76714
Fax: 905-521-4971
Address: 1-1280 Main St W
McMaster University Medical Centre
Department of Medicine
HSC 3H1B
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: 905-521-2100
Extension: 76714
Fax: 905-521-4971

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 Jan 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre Regional Rehabilitation Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Chedoke Hospital Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre Regional Rehabilitation Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Konstantinos Tselios Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Tselios (CPSO#: 104321 )
Business Address: 1280 Main St W
HSC 3H1B
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
04 Mar 2024
30 Jun 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 04 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. KONSTANTINOS TSELIOS may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Rheumatology, McMaster University, in which Dr. TSELIOS holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. TSELIOS no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. TSELIOS’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. TSELIOS’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 08 January, 2021, and expires on 30 June, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. TSELIOS's academic appointment at McMaster University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. KONSTANTINOS TSELIOS may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Rheumatology, McMaster University, in which Dr. TSELIOS holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. TSELIOS no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. TSELIOS’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. TSELIOS’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 08 January, 2021, and expires on 30 June, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. TSELIOS's academic appointment at McMaster University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Aristotelian University of Thessaloniki, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2027
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 Jun 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Jul 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2027

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jan 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 08 Jan 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014