THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:50:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv University, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Opg Wing
6Th Floor Room 6-813
700 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-4501
Extension: 5065
Fax: (416) 946-2288

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 29 Aug 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 29 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hogen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Nov 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Hogen (CPSO#: 104334 )
Business Address: Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
6th Floor, 6-813
700 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
(416) 946-4501 Extn: 5065

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Opg Wing
6Th Floor Room 6-813
700 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-4501
Extension: 5065
Fax: (416) 946-2288

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 29 Aug 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 29 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hogen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Nov 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Hogen (CPSO#: 104334 )
Business Address: Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
6th Floor, 6-813
700 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
(416) 946-4501 Extn: 5065

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
04 Jul 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 04 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. LIAT FRIDA HOGEN may practise medicine independently in obstetrics and gynecology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. LIAT FRIDA HOGEN may practise medicine independently in obstetrics and gynecology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 04 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014