THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:29:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 238 Barrie St
Queens Health Centre
Thornton ON L0L 2N0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 250-9544
Fax: (705) 291-2500

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. Yohn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Yohn (CPSO#: 104345 )
Business Address: 238 Barrie Street
Thornton Ontario L0L 2N0
7052509544

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 238 Barrie St
Queens Health Centre
Thornton ON L0L 2N0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 250-9544
Fax: (705) 291-2500

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. Yohn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Yohn (CPSO#: 104345 )
Business Address: 238 Barrie Street
Thornton Ontario L0L 2N0
7052509544

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAMIEN YOHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOHN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAMIEN YOHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOHN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Dec 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jan 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 May 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Aug 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 May 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 May 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014