THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 06:13:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Birmingham, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Oakville Medical
Suite 301
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 337-0040
Fax: 905-337-0044

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 24 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Navreet K Deol Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Mar 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Deol (CPSO#: 104361 )
Business Address: North Oakville Medical
3075 Hospital Gate
Suite 301
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
(905) 337-0040

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Birmingham, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Oakville Medical
Suite 301
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 337-0040
Fax: 905-337-0044

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 24 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Navreet K Deol Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Mar 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Deol (CPSO#: 104361 )
Business Address: North Oakville Medical
3075 Hospital Gate
Suite 301
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
(905) 337-0040

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAVREET KAUR DEOL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEOL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAVREET KAUR DEOL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEOL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Birmingham, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014