THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:53:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: Robertson, Theresa Amy Elizabeth (Used Until: 19 Sep 2016)
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robertson-Chenier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Robertson-Chenier (CPSO#: 104382 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6
705-743-2121

General Information

Former Name: Robertson, Theresa Amy Elizabeth (Used Until: 19 Sep 2016)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robertson-Chenier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Robertson-Chenier (CPSO#: 104382 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6
705-743-2121

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THERESA AMY ELIZABETH ROBERTSON-CHENIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERTSON-CHENIER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THERESA AMY ELIZABETH ROBERTSON-CHENIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERTSON-CHENIER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 May 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014