THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:33:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grand River Hospital
Dept of Emergency Medicine
835 King St West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 911 Queens Blvd
Dept of Emergency Medicine
Kitchener ON N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 744-3311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 13 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tracy Zhang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Zhang (CPSO#: 104384 )
Business Address: (519) 749-4300 Extn: 5959
Business Address: (519) 744-3311
Business Address: (519) 485-1700

Corporation Name: Tracy Zhang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Dec 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: Queen's University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grand River Hospital
Dept of Emergency Medicine
835 King St West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 911 Queens Blvd
Dept of Emergency Medicine
Kitchener ON N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 744-3311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 13 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tracy Zhang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Zhang (CPSO#: 104384 )
Business Address: (519) 749-4300 Extn: 5959
Business Address: (519) 744-3311
Business Address: (519) 485-1700

Corporation Name: Tracy Zhang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Dec 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TRACY LAN-ZHU ZHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TRACY LAN-ZHU ZHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Dec 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Mar 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014