THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:14:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Mysore, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, KANNADA

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: ST CATHARINES GENERAL HOSPITAL
Department of Anaesthesia
1200 FOURTH AVENUE
St. Catharines Ontario L2S0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5071
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Greater niagara hospital
5546 portage road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E6X2
Phone: 9053784647
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Welland general hospital
65 third street
Welland Ontario L3B 4W6
Phone: 9053784647
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 28 May 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 28 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Hanumanthaiah Ramegowda Hanuma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hanumanthaiah Ramegowda Hanuma (CPSO#: 104397 )
Business Address: 65 Third Street
Welland Ontario L3B 4W6
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: 5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6X2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, KANNADA
Medical School: University of Mysore, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: ST CATHARINES GENERAL HOSPITAL
Department of Anaesthesia
1200 FOURTH AVENUE
St. Catharines Ontario L2S0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5071
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Greater niagara hospital
5546 portage road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E6X2
Phone: 9053784647
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Welland general hospital
65 third street
Welland Ontario L3B 4W6
Phone: 9053784647
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 28 May 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 28 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Hanumanthaiah Ramegowda Hanuma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hanumanthaiah Ramegowda Hanuma (CPSO#: 104397 )
Business Address: 65 Third Street
Welland Ontario L3B 4W6
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: 5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6X2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEEPAK HANUMANTHAIAH RAMEGOWDA HANUMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANUMANTHAIAH RAMEGOWDA HANUMA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEEPAK HANUMANTHAIAH RAMEGOWDA HANUMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANUMANTHAIAH RAMEGOWDA HANUMA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Mysore, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014