THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:18:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 561 York Road
Guelph Ontario N1E 3J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-821-2440
Fax: 519-821-2448

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 29 Jul 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 29 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DANIEL HORSPOOL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Horspool (CPSO#: 104433 )
Business Address: 83 Dawson Road
#210
Guelph Ontario N1H 1B1
519-821-2440

Corporation Name: DANIEL HORSPOOL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Mar 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 561 York Road
Guelph Ontario N1E 3J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-821-2440
Fax: 519-821-2448

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 29 Jul 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 29 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DANIEL HORSPOOL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Horspool (CPSO#: 104433 )
Business Address: 83 Dawson Road
#210
Guelph Ontario N1H 1B1
519-821-2440

Corporation Name: DANIEL HORSPOOL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Mar 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL RICHARD HORSPOOL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HORSPOOL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL RICHARD HORSPOOL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HORSPOOL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Jul 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014