THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:43:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Vermont, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Womens College Hospital
Div of Gastroenterology
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 323-6400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Kensington Screening Clinic
340 College St #607
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
Phone: 416-928-9511
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Mt. Sinai Hospital
600 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Gastroenterology
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Talia Zenlea Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 May 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Zenlea (CPSO#: 104461 )
Business Address: 601-340 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
(416) 928-9511
Business Address: 6th Floor Endoscopy
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 596-4200
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
Division of Gastroenterology
4th Floor
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M6C 1R3
(416) 323-6400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Vermont, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Womens College Hospital
Div of Gastroenterology
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 323-6400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Kensington Screening Clinic
340 College St #607
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
Phone: 416-928-9511
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Mt. Sinai Hospital
600 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Gastroenterology
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Talia Zenlea Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 May 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Zenlea (CPSO#: 104461 )
Business Address: 601-340 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
(416) 928-9511
Business Address: 6th Floor Endoscopy
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 596-4200
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
Division of Gastroenterology
4th Floor
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M6C 1R3
(416) 323-6400

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
27 Nov 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 27 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Talia Zenlea may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and
gastroenterology.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Talia Zenlea may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and
gastroenterology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Vermont, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Nov 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 27 Nov 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Mar 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 2015

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Mar 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014