THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 03:44:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 2
6981 Millcreek Dr.
Mississauga Ontario L5N 6B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 724 7246
Fax: (289) 914 2273
Address: 701 Main St. W.
Hamilton Ontario L8S 1A2
Phone: (289) 768 7246
Fax: (289) 779 2273
Address: 300 Fourth Ave.
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0E6
Phone: (289) 724-7246
Fax: (289) 914-2273
Address: 2420 Eglington Ave. W.
Toronto Ontario M6M 1S6
Phone: (416) 410 0505
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Sacco Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sacco (CPSO#: 104464 )
Business Address: 2420 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M6M 1S6
(416) 410-0505
Business Address: 300 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0E6
(289) 724-7246
Business Address: 6981 Millcreek Drive
Suite 2
Mississauga Ontario L5N 6B8
(289) 724-7246
Business Address: 2404 Eglinton Ave W
York ON M6M 1S6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 2
6981 Millcreek Dr.
Mississauga Ontario L5N 6B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 724 7246
Fax: (289) 914 2273
Address: 701 Main St. W.
Hamilton Ontario L8S 1A2
Phone: (289) 768 7246
Fax: (289) 779 2273
Address: 300 Fourth Ave.
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0E6
Phone: (289) 724-7246
Fax: (289) 914-2273
Address: 2420 Eglington Ave. W.
Toronto Ontario M6M 1S6
Phone: (416) 410 0505
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Sacco Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sacco (CPSO#: 104464 )
Business Address: 2420 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M6M 1S6
(416) 410-0505
Business Address: 300 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0E6
(289) 724-7246
Business Address: 6981 Millcreek Drive
Suite 2
Mississauga Ontario L5N 6B8
(289) 724-7246
Business Address: 2404 Eglinton Ave W
York ON M6M 1S6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAFFAELE SACCO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SACCO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAFFAELE SACCO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SACCO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014