THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:38:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: Craig, Laura Margaret (Used Until: 10 Jul 2014)
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 220 Bagot St
Queens Family Health Team
Kingston Ontario K7L 3G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 533-9303
Fax: 613-544-4352

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Feb 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 13 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laura Kroeker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 May 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Kroeker (CPSO#: 104478 )
Business Address: Queens Family Health Team
220 Bagot Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5E9
(613) 533-9303

General Information

Former Name: Craig, Laura Margaret (Used Until: 10 Jul 2014)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 220 Bagot St
Queens Family Health Team
Kingston Ontario K7L 3G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 533-9303
Fax: 613-544-4352

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Feb 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 13 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laura Kroeker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 May 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Kroeker (CPSO#: 104478 )
Business Address: Queens Family Health Team
220 Bagot Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5E9
(613) 533-9303

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA MARGARET KROEKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KROEKER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA MARGARET KROEKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KROEKER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Feb 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014