THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:25:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Athens District Family Health Team
9 Willington East
Athens Ontario K0E 1B0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-924-2623
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexia de Jong Baumann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Sep 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. de Jong Baumann (CPSO#: 104491 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Athens District Family Health Team
9 Willington East
Athens Ontario K0E 1B0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-924-2623
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexia de Jong Baumann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Sep 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. de Jong Baumann (CPSO#: 104491 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXIA CLAZINA MARIA DE JONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE JONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXIA CLAZINA MARIA DE JONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE JONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014