THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:03:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Autonoma De Nuevo Leon, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Avenue
University of Toronto
Hospital for Sick Children
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 150 Kilgour Rd
East York ON M4G 1R8
Phone: (416) 425-6220
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 401 Smyth Road
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Medical Imaging/Pediatric Radiology
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Phone: 6137377600
Fax: No Information Available
Address: suite 301-45 Sheppard Avenue East
MyHealth Centre/Imaging clinics/Corporate Headquarters
Diagnostic Imaging
Toronto Ontario M2N 5W9
Phone: 6472070385
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 26 Jan 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 26 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Claudia Martinez Rios Arellano Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Feb 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Martinez Rios Arellano (CPSO#: 104496 )
Business Address: 555 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Universidad Autonoma De Nuevo Leon, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Avenue
University of Toronto
Hospital for Sick Children
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 150 Kilgour Rd
East York ON M4G 1R8
Phone: (416) 425-6220
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 401 Smyth Road
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Medical Imaging/Pediatric Radiology
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Phone: 6137377600
Fax: No Information Available
Address: suite 301-45 Sheppard Avenue East
MyHealth Centre/Imaging clinics/Corporate Headquarters
Diagnostic Imaging
Toronto Ontario M2N 5W9
Phone: 6472070385
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 26 Jan 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 26 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Claudia Martinez Rios Arellano Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Feb 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Martinez Rios Arellano (CPSO#: 104496 )
Business Address: 555 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X8

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
31 Jan 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 31 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Claudia Monica Martinez Rios Arellano may practise medicine independently in Diagnostic Radiology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Claudia Monica Martinez Rios Arellano may practise medicine independently in Diagnostic Radiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Autonoma De Nuevo Leon, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 31 Jan 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 22 Jan 2030

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014