THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:14:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Jordan Faculty of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 217 Terrace Hill St
Unit 128
Brantford ON N3R 1G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519)304-8882
Fax: (519)304-7880

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bahnam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 May 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bahnam (CPSO#: 104499 )
Business Address: Milton District Hospital
725 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 9K1
(905) 878-2383
Business Address: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4300
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford ON N3R 1G9
5197527871

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Jordan Faculty of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 217 Terrace Hill St
Unit 128
Brantford ON N3R 1G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519)304-8882
Fax: (519)304-7880

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bahnam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 May 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bahnam (CPSO#: 104499 )
Business Address: Milton District Hospital
725 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 9K1
(905) 878-2383
Business Address: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4300
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford ON N3R 1G9
5197527871

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MENA BAHNAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAHNAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MENA BAHNAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAHNAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Jordan Faculty of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014