THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:56:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de Medicina, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Hospital
Division of Neurology
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3259
Fax: 519-6633265
Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 3N3
Phone: (519) 646-6100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 20 Jul 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 20 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: RICCIO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Riccio (CPSO#: 104509 )
Business Address: 339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6G 2M3
519-685-8500
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
519-685-8500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de Medicina, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Hospital
Division of Neurology
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3259
Fax: 519-6633265
Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 3N3
Phone: (519) 646-6100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 20 Jul 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 20 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: RICCIO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Riccio (CPSO#: 104509 )
Business Address: 339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6G 2M3
519-685-8500
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
519-685-8500

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
20 Jul 2024
30 Jun 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 20 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. PATRICIA MARIANA RICCIO may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Clinical Neurological Sciences, Division of Neurology, Western University, in which Dr. RICCIO holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. RICCIO no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. RICCIO’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. RICCIO’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 20 July, 2024, and expires on 30 June, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. RICCIO's academic appointment at Western University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. PATRICIA MARIANA RICCIO may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Clinical Neurological Sciences, Division of Neurology, Western University, in which Dr. RICCIO holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. RICCIO no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. RICCIO’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. RICCIO’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 20 July, 2024, and expires on 30 June, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. RICCIO's academic appointment at Western University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de Medicina, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Mar 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Sep 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Mar 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014