THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:03:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 604-73 Water St N
Water Street Obstetrics & Gynecology
Cambridge ON N1R 7L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 804-2030
Fax: (519)618-9110

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ariel Mendlowitz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mendlowitz (CPSO#: 104592 )
Business Address: 73 Water St N
Unit 604
Cambridge ON N1R 7L6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 604-73 Water St N
Water Street Obstetrics & Gynecology
Cambridge ON N1R 7L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 804-2030
Fax: (519)618-9110

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ariel Mendlowitz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mendlowitz (CPSO#: 104592 )
Business Address: 73 Water St N
Unit 604
Cambridge ON N1R 7L6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARIEL RACHELLE MENDLOWITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENDLOWITZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARIEL RACHELLE MENDLOWITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENDLOWITZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Aug 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2014