THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 05:06:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saint James School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
146 Oliver Rd
Campbellford Ontario K0L 1L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 653-1140
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 222 King Street East
Suite 3200
Bowmanville Ontario L1C1P6
Phone: (905) 623-2355
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200-86 Angeline St S
Lindsay ON K9V 6C5
Phone: 7053282019
Fax: 7053281842

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Feb 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 24 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Venetia Wijayakumar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Wijayakumar (CPSO#: 104604 )
Business Address: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
146 Oliver Road
Campbellcroft Ontario K0L 1L0
(705) 653-1140
Business Address: 3100-222 King St E
Bowmanville ON L1C 1P6
905-623-2355

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saint James School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
146 Oliver Rd
Campbellford Ontario K0L 1L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 653-1140
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 222 King Street East
Suite 3200
Bowmanville Ontario L1C1P6
Phone: (905) 623-2355
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200-86 Angeline St S
Lindsay ON K9V 6C5
Phone: 7053282019
Fax: 7053281842

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Feb 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 24 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Venetia Wijayakumar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Wijayakumar (CPSO#: 104604 )
Business Address: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
146 Oliver Road
Campbellcroft Ontario K0L 1L0
(705) 653-1140
Business Address: 3100-222 King St E
Bowmanville ON L1C 1P6
905-623-2355

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
24 Jan 2019
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 24 2019
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Venetia Wijayakumar may practise medicine independently in internal
medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Venetia Wijayakumar may practise medicine independently in internal
medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saint James School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 Jan 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 02 Aug 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Mar 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 28 Dec 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Aug 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 Jan 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 28 Dec 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Feb 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Feb 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 2014