THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:30:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hugh Allen Clinic
PO Box 489
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 807-737-3803
Fax: 807-737-1771

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mary England Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. England (CPSO#: 104610 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hugh Allen Clinic
PO Box 489
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 807-737-3803
Fax: 807-737-1771

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mary England Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. England (CPSO#: 104610 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY CATHERINE ENGLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENGLAND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY CATHERINE ENGLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENGLAND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2014