THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:00:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Department of Radiology
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055214322
Extension: 46521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 366 Bay Street, 10th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5H 4B2
Phone: 877-381-1493
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 26 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. Mammen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Nov 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Mammen (CPSO#: 104622 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Department of Radiology
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055214322
Extension: 46521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 366 Bay Street, 10th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5H 4B2
Phone: 877-381-1493
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 26 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. Mammen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Nov 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Mammen (CPSO#: 104622 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS MAMMEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAMMEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS MAMMEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAMMEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 24 Jul 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 2014