THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:15:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universitatea Iuliu Hatieganu, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
Department of Radiology
980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8076323154
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 20 Jul 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 20 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
Sante Manitouwadge Health Manitouwadge
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: McCausland Hospital
LOCATION: Terrace Bay

HOSPITAL: Wilson Memorial General Hospital
LOCATION: Marathon

HOSPITAL: Nipigon District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Nipigon

HOSPITAL: Sante Manitouwadge Health
LOCATION: Manitouwadge

HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Radu Rozenberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Rozenberg (CPSO#: 104626 )
Business Address: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
Department of Radiology
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6000 Extn: 5827

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Universitatea Iuliu Hatieganu, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
Department of Radiology
980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8076323154
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 20 Jul 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 20 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
Sante Manitouwadge Health Manitouwadge
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: McCausland Hospital
LOCATION: Terrace Bay

HOSPITAL: Wilson Memorial General Hospital
LOCATION: Marathon

HOSPITAL: Nipigon District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Nipigon

HOSPITAL: Sante Manitouwadge Health
LOCATION: Manitouwadge

HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Radu Rozenberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Rozenberg (CPSO#: 104626 )
Business Address: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
Department of Radiology
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6000 Extn: 5827

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
09 Mar 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 09 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. RADU ROZENBERG may practise medicine independently in diagnostic radiology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. RADU ROZENBERG may practise medicine independently in diagnostic radiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universitatea Iuliu Hatieganu, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Mar 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 2014