THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:02:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Kwazulu-Natal, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 911 Queens Blvd
St. Mary’s General Hospital
Cardiac Anesthesia/CVICU
Kitchener ON N2M 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5197443311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 16 Jul 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 16 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ranjana Bairagi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Dec 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bairagi (CPSO#: 104635 )
Business Address: Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4300

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Kwazulu-Natal, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 911 Queens Blvd
St. Mary’s General Hospital
Cardiac Anesthesia/CVICU
Kitchener ON N2M 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5197443311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 16 Jul 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 16 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ranjana Bairagi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Dec 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bairagi (CPSO#: 104635 )
Business Address: Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4300

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RANJANA BAIRAGI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAIRAGI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RANJANA BAIRAGI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAIRAGI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Kwazulu-Natal, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2014
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2014