THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 04:49:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake road
Sudbury Ontario P3E5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-878-2383
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H7
Phone: (705) 789-0022
Extension: 2379
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Milton District Hospital
725 Bronte St S
Milton Ontario L9T9K1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Renee Borkovich Medicine Professional Corporation/Societe Professionnelle Medicale Renee Borkovich
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Borkovich (CPSO#: 104662 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake road
Sudbury Ontario P3E5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-878-2383
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H7
Phone: (705) 789-0022
Extension: 2379
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Milton District Hospital
725 Bronte St S
Milton Ontario L9T9K1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Renee Borkovich Medicine Professional Corporation/Societe Professionnelle Medicale Renee Borkovich
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Borkovich (CPSO#: 104662 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RENEE MICHELLE BORKOVICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORKOVICH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RENEE MICHELLE BORKOVICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORKOVICH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Aug 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2014