THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:54:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300-5307 Canotek Rd
Gloucester ON K1J 9M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 746-6223
Fax: (613) 746-6018
Address: Cochrane Family Health Team
233 8th Street
Cochrane Ontario P0L 1C0
Phone: (705) 272-4200
Fax: (705) 272-2676

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Oct 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 14 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lady Minto Hospital Cochrane
HOSPITAL: Lady Minto Hospital
LOCATION: Cochrane

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Theodore Whitfield Small Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Small (CPSO#: 104669 )
Business Address: Lady Minto Hospital
241 8th Street
Cochrane Ontario P0L 1C0
(705) 272-7200
Business Address: 300-5307 Canotek Rd
Gloucester ON K1J 9M2
613-746-6223

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300-5307 Canotek Rd
Gloucester ON K1J 9M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 746-6223
Fax: (613) 746-6018
Address: Cochrane Family Health Team
233 8th Street
Cochrane Ontario P0L 1C0
Phone: (705) 272-4200
Fax: (705) 272-2676

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Oct 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 14 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lady Minto Hospital Cochrane
HOSPITAL: Lady Minto Hospital
LOCATION: Cochrane

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Theodore Whitfield Small Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Small (CPSO#: 104669 )
Business Address: Lady Minto Hospital
241 8th Street
Cochrane Ontario P0L 1C0
(705) 272-7200
Business Address: 300-5307 Canotek Rd
Gloucester ON K1J 9M2
613-746-6223

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THEODORE WHITFIELD SMALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMALL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THEODORE WHITFIELD SMALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMALL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Oct 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2014