THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:53:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 105 Main Street
Main Floor
Delhi Ontario N4B 2L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-549-4004
Fax: 519-582-3770

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
HOSPITAL: Temiskaming Hospital
LOCATION: New Liskeard

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jamie Szabo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Nov 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Szabo (CPSO#: 104679 )
Business Address: 365 West Street
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1T7
Business Address: 1035B Bay Street
Port Rowan Ontario N0E 1M0
(519) 586-3143

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 105 Main Street
Main Floor
Delhi Ontario N4B 2L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-549-4004
Fax: 519-582-3770

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
HOSPITAL: Temiskaming Hospital
LOCATION: New Liskeard

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jamie Szabo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Nov 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Szabo (CPSO#: 104679 )
Business Address: 365 West Street
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1T7
Business Address: 1035B Bay Street
Port Rowan Ontario N0E 1M0
(519) 586-3143

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMIE REBECCA SZABO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZABO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMIE REBECCA SZABO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZABO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Aug 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2014