THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:54:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Center
Department of Palliative Care
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164806100
Extension: 89596
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Sarah Torabi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Torabi (CPSO#: 104727 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
H-355
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5

Corporation Name: Dr. Sarah Torabi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Apr 2023

Corporation Name: Dr. Sarah Torabi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 May 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Center
Department of Palliative Care
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164806100
Extension: 89596
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Sarah Torabi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Torabi (CPSO#: 104727 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
H-355
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5

Corporation Name: Dr. Sarah Torabi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Apr 2023

Corporation Name: Dr. Sarah Torabi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 May 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH ALISON TORABI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TORABI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH ALISON TORABI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TORABI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2014
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Aug 2014