THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:55:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Jiwaji University, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial
Hospital
Department of Radiology
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-8452571
Extension: 3642
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 17 May 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 17 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chaturvedi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Chaturvedi (CPSO#: 104745 )
Business Address: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571 Extn: 3642

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: Jiwaji University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial
Hospital
Department of Radiology
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-8452571
Extension: 3642
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 17 May 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 17 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chaturvedi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Chaturvedi (CPSO#: 104745 )
Business Address: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571 Extn: 3642

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATANJALI CHATURVEDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHATURVEDI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATANJALI CHATURVEDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHATURVEDI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Jiwaji University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2014
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2014