THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 06:59:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Illinois, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058132200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Brookfield Place
181 Bay Street
Suite 3000
Toronto Ontario M5J 2T3
Phone: 416-507-6600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Aug 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 12 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: VIPAN NIKORE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Nikore (CPSO#: 104755 )
Business Address: 2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8

Corporation Name: Vipan Nikore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 May 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Illinois, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058132200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Brookfield Place
181 Bay Street
Suite 3000
Toronto Ontario M5J 2T3
Phone: 416-507-6600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Aug 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 12 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: VIPAN NIKORE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Nikore (CPSO#: 104755 )
Business Address: 2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8

Corporation Name: Vipan Nikore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 May 2023

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
27 Nov 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 27 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Vipan Nikore may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Vipan Nikore may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Illinois, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Nov 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2014