THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:34:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 101
1055 Fanshawe Park Road West
London Ontario N6G0W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 472-0040
Fax: 519-472-7732

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Nov 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patrick Chang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Feb 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Chang (CPSO#: 104760 )
Business Address: 101 - 1055 Fanshawe Park Road West
London Ontario N6G 0W7
(519) 472-0040

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 101
1055 Fanshawe Park Road West
London Ontario N6G0W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 472-0040
Fax: 519-472-7732

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Nov 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patrick Chang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Feb 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Chang (CPSO#: 104760 )
Business Address: 101 - 1055 Fanshawe Park Road West
London Ontario N6G 0W7
(519) 472-0040

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICK CHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICK CHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Nov 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2014