THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:47:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Columbia University, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-2132
Fax: (416) 946-6566

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 01 Sep 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Scott Bratman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Feb 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bratman (CPSO#: 104768 )
Business Address: Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
700 University Avenue
Suite 7-415
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
(416) 946-2132

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Columbia University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-2132
Fax: (416) 946-6566

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 01 Sep 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Scott Bratman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Feb 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bratman (CPSO#: 104768 )
Business Address: Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
700 University Avenue
Suite 7-415
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
(416) 946-2132

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
27 May 2021
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 27 2021
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Scott Victor Bratman may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Radiation
Oncology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Bratman holds an
academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Bratman no longer holds the
appointment, referred to in clause 1.




VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Scott Victor Bratman may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Radiation
Oncology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Bratman holds an
academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Bratman no longer holds the
appointment, referred to in clause 1.




Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Columbia University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 May 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 May 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2014