THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:04:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Belgrade, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BOSNIAN, CROATIAN, SERBIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Western Hospital (UHN)
Division of Neurology
399 Bathurst Street
West Wing, 5th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166035826
Fax: 4166037733

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 01 Sep 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pikula Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pikula (CPSO#: 104799 )
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital (UHN)
Division of Neurology
399 Bathurst Street
West Wing 5th Floor, Suite 439
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 664-0929

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BOSNIAN, CROATIAN, SERBIAN
Medical School: University of Belgrade, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Western Hospital (UHN)
Division of Neurology
399 Bathurst Street
West Wing, 5th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166035826
Fax: 4166037733

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 01 Sep 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pikula Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pikula (CPSO#: 104799 )
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital (UHN)
Division of Neurology
399 Bathurst Street
West Wing 5th Floor, Suite 439
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 664-0929

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
25 Aug 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 25 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ALEKSANDRA PIKULA may practise medicine independently in neurology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ALEKSANDRA PIKULA may practise medicine independently in neurology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Belgrade, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 Aug 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 05 Aug 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 05 Aug 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2014