THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:22:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
800 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Aug 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sumit Chaudhari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chaudhari (CPSO#: 104802 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
800 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Aug 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sumit Chaudhari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chaudhari (CPSO#: 104802 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUMIT CHAUDHARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUDHARI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUMIT CHAUDHARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUDHARI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2014