THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:45:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Winchester District
Memorial Hospital
566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C2K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 774-2420
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 13 Oct 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 13 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jones-Delcorde Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jones-Delcorde (CPSO#: 104812 )
Business Address: 566 Louise St
Winchester ON K0C 2K0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Winchester District
Memorial Hospital
566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C2K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 774-2420
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 13 Oct 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 13 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jones-Delcorde Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jones-Delcorde (CPSO#: 104812 )
Business Address: 566 Louise St
Winchester ON K0C 2K0

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADAM DAVID HAROLD JONES-DELCORDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES-DELCORDE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADAM DAVID HAROLD JONES-DELCORDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES-DELCORDE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 May 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2014