THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 02:59:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Mahatma Gandhi Memorial Medical College, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cambridge Medical Center
1174 King Street East
Cambridge Ontario N3H 3P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 219 6100
Fax: (519) 219-6400
Address: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 16 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ashish Porwal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Feb 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Porwal (CPSO#: 104816 )
Business Address: Suite 5
715 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7R1
(519) 623-1800
Business Address: 1174 King Street East
Cambridge Ontario N3H 3P6
5192196100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: Mahatma Gandhi Memorial Medical College, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cambridge Medical Center
1174 King Street East
Cambridge Ontario N3H 3P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 219 6100
Fax: (519) 219-6400
Address: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 16 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ashish Porwal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Feb 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Porwal (CPSO#: 104816 )
Business Address: Suite 5
715 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7R1
(519) 623-1800
Business Address: 1174 King Street East
Cambridge Ontario N3H 3P6
5192196100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASHISH PORWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PORWAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASHISH PORWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PORWAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Mahatma Gandhi Memorial Medical College, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 May 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Aug 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 03 Aug 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2014
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 May 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 May 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2014