THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:24:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: The University of Western Australia Faculty of Health and Medical Sciences, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Vascular Surgery
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 42030
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 35 Upper Centennial Parkway
One Vascular
Unit 3C
Hamilton Ontario L8J 3W2
Phone: 9056623174
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3280 Bloor Street West
One Vascular
Toronto Ontario M8X 2X3
Phone: 4165161704
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 25 May 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 25 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre Regional Rehabilitation Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre Regional Rehabilitation Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Stacey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Apr 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Stacey (CPSO#: 104820 )
Business Address: 169 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P3
(905) 945-2253
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155
Business Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Vascular Surgery
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 73881
Business Address: 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: 20 Railway Street
Hamilton Ontario L8R 2R3
9055231444
Business Address: 3C-35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Hamilton Ontario L8J 2T6
Business Address: Suite 1070-3280 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M8X 2X3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: The University of Western Australia Faculty of Health and Medical Sciences, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Vascular Surgery
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 42030
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 35 Upper Centennial Parkway
One Vascular
Unit 3C
Hamilton Ontario L8J 3W2
Phone: 9056623174
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3280 Bloor Street West
One Vascular
Toronto Ontario M8X 2X3
Phone: 4165161704
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 25 May 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 25 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre Regional Rehabilitation Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre Regional Rehabilitation Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Stacey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Apr 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Stacey (CPSO#: 104820 )
Business Address: 169 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P3
(905) 945-2253
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155
Business Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Vascular Surgery
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 73881
Business Address: 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: 20 Railway Street
Hamilton Ontario L8R 2R3
9055231444
Business Address: 3C-35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Hamilton Ontario L8J 2T6
Business Address: Suite 1070-3280 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M8X 2X3

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
10 Aug 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 10 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MICHAEL CONWAY STACEY may practise medicine independently in vascular surgery.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MICHAEL CONWAY STACEY may practise medicine independently in vascular surgery.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: The University of Western Australia Faculty of Health and Medical Sciences, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 10 Aug 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 28 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2014