THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:08:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Australian National University, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 125 Lakeview Avenue
Kingston Ontario K7M 3T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 384-4664
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 564 Tanner Drive
Kingston Ontario K7M0C3
Phone: 6135441155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Sep 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Baxfield Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Baxfield (CPSO#: 104835 )
Business Address: Reddendale Family Health Centre
125 Lakeview Avenue
Kingston Ontario K7M 3T6
(613) 384-4664

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Australian National University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 125 Lakeview Avenue
Kingston Ontario K7M 3T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 384-4664
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 564 Tanner Drive
Kingston Ontario K7M0C3
Phone: 6135441155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Sep 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Baxfield Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Baxfield (CPSO#: 104835 )
Business Address: Reddendale Family Health Centre
125 Lakeview Avenue
Kingston Ontario K7M 3T6
(613) 384-4664

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICHOLAS CHARLES MACNEILL BAXFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAXFIELD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICHOLAS CHARLES MACNEILL BAXFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAXFIELD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Australian National University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014