THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:24:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058452571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Department of Hospital Medicine
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Phone: 905-845-2571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Sep 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kamal Riaz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 May 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Riaz (CPSO#: 116821 ) Dr. M. Kamal (CPSO#: 104842 )
Business Address: Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville Ontario K6V 1S8
(613) 345-5649
Business Address: 1686 Heritage Way
Oakville ON L6M 2Z9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058452571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Department of Hospital Medicine
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Phone: 905-845-2571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Sep 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kamal Riaz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 May 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Riaz (CPSO#: 116821 ) Dr. M. Kamal (CPSO#: 104842 )
Business Address: Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville Ontario K6V 1S8
(613) 345-5649
Business Address: 1686 Heritage Way
Oakville ON L6M 2Z9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAAZ ANWER KAMAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAMAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAAZ ANWER KAMAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAMAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014