THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:09:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Courtice Health Centre
1450 Highway 2
Courtice Ontario L1E 3C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-721-4999
Fax: 905-721-6173

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Sep 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen Bathe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jul 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bathe (CPSO#: 104858 )
Business Address: 1450 Highway 2
Courtice Ontario L1E 3C3
(905) 721-4999

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Courtice Health Centre
1450 Highway 2
Courtice Ontario L1E 3C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-721-4999
Fax: 905-721-6173

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Sep 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen Bathe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jul 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bathe (CPSO#: 104858 )
Business Address: 1450 Highway 2
Courtice Ontario L1E 3C3
(905) 721-4999

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN PETER BATHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BATHE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN PETER BATHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BATHE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014