THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 03:08:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4001 Leslie St
North York ON M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167566479
Fax: 4167566152
Address: 10 Buchan Crt
North York ON M2J 1V2
Phone: 4167566000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5090-3080 Yonge St
Toronto Psychology & Wellness Group
Eating Disorder Program
Toronto ON M4N 3N1
Phone: (647) 344-5448
Fax: (647) 277-1225

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rachel Allison Barrett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Barrett (CPSO#: 104877 )
Business Address: 4001 Leslie St
North York ON M2K 1E1
4167566002
Business Address: 825 Coxwell Ave
East York ON M4C 3E7
4164618272
Business Address: 10 Buchan Crt
North York ON M2J 1V2
4167566000
Business Address: 1371 Neilson Rd
Scarborough ON M1B 4Z8
4162829198

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4001 Leslie St
North York ON M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167566479
Fax: 4167566152
Address: 10 Buchan Crt
North York ON M2J 1V2
Phone: 4167566000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5090-3080 Yonge St
Toronto Psychology & Wellness Group
Eating Disorder Program
Toronto ON M4N 3N1
Phone: (647) 344-5448
Fax: (647) 277-1225

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rachel Allison Barrett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Barrett (CPSO#: 104877 )
Business Address: 4001 Leslie St
North York ON M2K 1E1
4167566002
Business Address: 825 Coxwell Ave
East York ON M4C 3E7
4164618272
Business Address: 10 Buchan Crt
North York ON M2J 1V2
4167566000
Business Address: 1371 Neilson Rd
Scarborough ON M1B 4Z8
4162829198

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RACHEL ALLISON BARRETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARRETT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RACHEL ALLISON BARRETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARRETT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 May 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 Feb 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Oct 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 May 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Dec 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Nov 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2014