THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:09:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 403 Picton Main St
Picton ON K0K 2T0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-476-8323
Fax: 613-471-1846

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Sep 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site
LOCATION: Picton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adamek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Adamek (CPSO#: 104889 )
Business Address: 8-389 Main St
Picton ON K0K 2T0
Business Address: PO Box 382
Wellington ON K0K 3L0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 403 Picton Main St
Picton ON K0K 2T0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-476-8323
Fax: 613-471-1846

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Sep 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site
LOCATION: Picton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adamek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Adamek (CPSO#: 104889 )
Business Address: 8-389 Main St
Picton ON K0K 2T0
Business Address: PO Box 382
Wellington ON K0K 3L0

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAMARA LEIGH ADAMEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADAMEK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAMARA LEIGH ADAMEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADAMEK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Sep 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014