THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:35:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Medical Centre
Suite 201
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay,ON
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 684-6700
Fax: (807) 577-6465
Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Hospital
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: 905-848-7100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 24 Feb 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Feb 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 24 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 24 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ghazala Iffat Basir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Oct 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Basir (CPSO#: 104938 )
Business Address: Medical Centre
201 - 984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7C7
(807) 684-6700

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Medical Centre
Suite 201
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay,ON
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 684-6700
Fax: (807) 577-6465
Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Hospital
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: 905-848-7100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 24 Feb 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Feb 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 24 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 24 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ghazala Iffat Basir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Oct 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Basir (CPSO#: 104938 )
Business Address: Medical Centre
201 - 984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7C7
(807) 684-6700

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
28 Sep 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 28 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. GHAZALA IFFAT BASIR may practise medicine independently in Neurology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. GHAZALA IFFAT BASIR may practise medicine independently in Neurology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 28 Sep 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Nov 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2028

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Feb 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Feb 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2014