THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:57:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 20887 Dalton Road
Sutton West Ontario L0E 1R0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 904-6161
Fax: (905) 215-2235

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul T. Saad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Saad (CPSO#: 104943 )
Business Address: Georgina Community Health Care
201 - 417 The Queensway South
Keswick Ontario L4P 2C7
(905) 989-7800

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 20887 Dalton Road
Sutton West Ontario L0E 1R0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 904-6161
Fax: (905) 215-2235

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul T. Saad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Saad (CPSO#: 104943 )
Business Address: Georgina Community Health Care
201 - 417 The Queensway South
Keswick Ontario L4P 2C7
(905) 989-7800

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
24 May 2017
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 24 2017
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Paul Timothy Saad may practise medicine independently in family medicine.


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Paul Timothy Saad may practise medicine independently in family medicine.


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 May 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 17 Mar 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 May 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 Mar 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2014