THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:14:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. Matthew's University, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1428 Highway 2
Courtice ON L1E 2J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057287915
Fax: 9054430171

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Sep 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Salhab Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Salhab (CPSO#: 104944 )
Business Address: Medical Trust Clinics
247 Simcoe Street North
First Floor
Oshawa Ontario L1G 4T3
(905) 728-7915
Business Address: 1428 Highway 2
Courtice ON L1E 2J5
9057287915

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. Matthew's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1428 Highway 2
Courtice ON L1E 2J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057287915
Fax: 9054430171

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Sep 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Salhab Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Salhab (CPSO#: 104944 )
Business Address: Medical Trust Clinics
247 Simcoe Street North
First Floor
Oshawa Ontario L1G 4T3
(905) 728-7915
Business Address: 1428 Highway 2
Courtice ON L1E 2J5
9057287915

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
20 May 2016
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 20 2016
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Antonia Karen Salhab may practice medicine independently in family
medicine.


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Antonia Karen Salhab may practice medicine independently in family
medicine.


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. Matthew's University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 May 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 02 Mar 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 May 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 02 Mar 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2014