THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:51:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Al-Nahrain University, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Kingsbridge Garden Cir
Greater Niagara Medical Imaging (GNMI)
Mississauga ON L5R 3K6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 568-3768
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Greater Niagara Medical Imaging (GNMI)
300 Harwood Ave S
Ajax ON L1S 2J1
Phone: (905) 426-8976
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 08 Jan 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Zaid Jibri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Jibri (CPSO#: 104955 )
Business Address: 10 Kingsbridge Garden Cir
Greater Niagara Medical Imaging (GNMI)
Mississauga ON L5R 3K6
(905) 568-3768

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Al-Nahrain University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Kingsbridge Garden Cir
Greater Niagara Medical Imaging (GNMI)
Mississauga ON L5R 3K6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 568-3768
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Greater Niagara Medical Imaging (GNMI)
300 Harwood Ave S
Ajax ON L1S 2J1
Phone: (905) 426-8976
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 08 Jan 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Zaid Jibri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Jibri (CPSO#: 104955 )
Business Address: 10 Kingsbridge Garden Cir
Greater Niagara Medical Imaging (GNMI)
Mississauga ON L5R 3K6
(905) 568-3768

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
08 Jan 2021
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 08 2021
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ZAID ADIL JIBRI may practise medicine independently in diagnostic radiology.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ZAID ADIL JIBRI may practise medicine independently in diagnostic radiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Al-Nahrain University, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 Jan 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 Jul 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Jan 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2014