THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:50:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: M.Gorky Donetsk National Medical Univ., 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9160 Bayview Avenue
B01
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 0E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-997-5559
Fax: 365-509-2982
Address: 2 Champagne Drive
A4
Toronto Ontario M3J 3H7
Phone: 416-222-6160
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Feb 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 03 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eugene Bondarev Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 May 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Bondarev (CPSO#: 104962 )
Business Address: 9160 Bayview Avenue
Unit B01
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 0E6
416-997-5559
Business Address: Polyclinic Family Health Group
Suite A4
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto Ontario M3J 2C5
(416) 222-6160

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN
Medical School: M.Gorky Donetsk National Medical Univ., 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9160 Bayview Avenue
B01
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 0E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-997-5559
Fax: 365-509-2982
Address: 2 Champagne Drive
A4
Toronto Ontario M3J 3H7
Phone: 416-222-6160
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Feb 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 03 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eugene Bondarev Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 May 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Bondarev (CPSO#: 104962 )
Business Address: 9160 Bayview Avenue
Unit B01
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 0E6
416-997-5559
Business Address: Polyclinic Family Health Group
Suite A4
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto Ontario M3J 2C5
(416) 222-6160

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EUGENE BONDAREV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BONDAREV is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EUGENE BONDAREV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BONDAREV is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: M.Gorky Donetsk National Medical Univ., 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Apr 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2014
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Apr 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Apr 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2014