THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:53:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 411 Burnhamthorpe Road West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 0J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052324007
Fax: 6476896499
Address: 264 Main St E
Newcare medical clinic
Grimsby ON L3M 1P8
Phone: 9053094646
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 14 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leena Shahbaz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Shahbaz (CPSO#: 104963 )
Business Address: 2200 Dundas St E
Telemed MD
300
Toronto ON M6R 1X3
1-888-350-2323 Extn: 4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 411 Burnhamthorpe Road West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 0J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052324007
Fax: 6476896499
Address: 264 Main St E
Newcare medical clinic
Grimsby ON L3M 1P8
Phone: 9053094646
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 14 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leena Shahbaz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Shahbaz (CPSO#: 104963 )
Business Address: 2200 Dundas St E
Telemed MD
300
Toronto ON M6R 1X3
1-888-350-2323 Extn: 4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEENA SHAHBAZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAHBAZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEENA SHAHBAZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAHBAZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Nov 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Oct 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2014