THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 11:35:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial
Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058452571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DRS. S. THARMALINGAM & A. VETIVELU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Vetivelu (CPSO#: 109276 ) Dr. S. Tharmalingam (CPSO#: 104986 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Business Address: 300-581 Argus Rd
Oakville ON L6J 3J4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial
Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058452571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DRS. S. THARMALINGAM & A. VETIVELU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Vetivelu (CPSO#: 109276 ) Dr. S. Tharmalingam (CPSO#: 104986 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Business Address: 300-581 Argus Rd
Oakville ON L6J 3J4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SURENTHAR THARMALINGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THARMALINGAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SURENTHAR THARMALINGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THARMALINGAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Apr 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Nov 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2014