THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:56:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Turnbull Medical Building
170 Simcoe Street, Suite 203
Peterborough Ontario K9H 2H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-743-3837
Fax: 705-740-7594
Address: Trent University
Student Health Services
1600 West Bank Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9L 0G2
Phone: 705-748-1481
Fax: 705-748-1055

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Oct 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 14 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Lem Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Oct 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lem (CPSO#: 104987 )
Business Address: 170 Simcoe Street
Suite 203
Peterborough Ontario K9H 3P9
705-743-3837

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Turnbull Medical Building
170 Simcoe Street, Suite 203
Peterborough Ontario K9H 2H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-743-3837
Fax: 705-740-7594
Address: Trent University
Student Health Services
1600 West Bank Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9L 0G2
Phone: 705-748-1481
Fax: 705-748-1055

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Oct 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 14 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Lem Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Oct 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lem (CPSO#: 104987 )
Business Address: 170 Simcoe Street
Suite 203
Peterborough Ontario K9H 3P9
705-743-3837

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER WALTER LEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER WALTER LEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Oct 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2014