THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:54:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ningxia Medical College, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 250
123 Third Avenue
Timmins Ontario P4N 1C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 264-1313
Fax: 705-268-7444
Address: 700 Ross Ave E
Timmins And District Hospital
Timmins Ontario P4N8P2
Phone: 705-267-2131
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Oct 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 13 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
China

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ming Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Sep 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Li (CPSO#: 104990 )
Business Address: 123 Third Avenue
Suite 250
Timmins Ontario P4N 1C6
(705) 264-1313
Business Address: 700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
(705) 267-2131
Business Address: 4715 ON-101 East
South Porcupine Ontario P0N 1H0
(705) 235-6900

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: Ningxia Medical College, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 250
123 Third Avenue
Timmins Ontario P4N 1C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 264-1313
Fax: 705-268-7444
Address: 700 Ross Ave E
Timmins And District Hospital
Timmins Ontario P4N8P2
Phone: 705-267-2131
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Oct 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 13 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
China

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ming Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Sep 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Li (CPSO#: 104990 )
Business Address: 123 Third Avenue
Suite 250
Timmins Ontario P4N 1C6
(705) 264-1313
Business Address: 700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
(705) 267-2131
Business Address: 4715 ON-101 East
South Porcupine Ontario P0N 1H0
(705) 235-6900

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MING LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MING LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ningxia Medical College, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2014